In the last lesson of **Vedic Multiplication Methods**, I mean here that in my last post I have explained the step-by-step procedure of **Vedic Multiplication Methods**. If you not read that post, you can read here to understand full concept of this **fast calculation methods**. In this post, I will demonstrate **How to multiply with base of hundred within 15 secs?** As I already explained the concept of **Vedic Multiplication** in my previous post. Now, I will show the examples with little description. But you will be able to understand. So, Lets start with the first example: **How to Multiply with Base of 100** **Example 1.** Multiply 78 by 96 **Step 1. **Well, here base is hundred, Put the two numbers 78 and 96 above and below on the **left-hand side.** **Step 2. **For the **right-hand-side**, find out **Deviation** of both numbers. That is, 78-100 = -22 and 96-100 = –04 , Write Numbers as shown below:

**Step 3. **Now, for the **right-hand-side** of answer multiply the **deviations** 22 and 04, you will get 88, that is right hand side of the answer. **Step 4.** As I already explained that there are four ways of find out the **left-hand-side** of the answer. Here, I used 78-04=74. You can use any of the **four ways to find out left-portion** of the answer.

Hence, 78 x 96 = 7488, Here, A vertical dividing line(‘|’) has drawn for the purpose of demarcation of the two parts. Below are the some examples of **Multiply with base of 100**.

**Here are some points to remember:**

- In all these cases, note that both the cross-subtractions always give the same remainder (for the left-hand-side portion of the-answer)
- Here too, note that the vertical multiplication (for the
**right-hand side portion**of the**product**) may, in some cases, yield a**more-than-two-digit product**; but, with 100 as our base, we can have only two digits on the**right-hand side**. We should therefore adopt the same method as before (i.e. keep the permissible two digits on the right-hand side and "carry" the surplus or extra digit over to the left) (as in the case of ordinary addition, compound addition etc.). See the following examples. Have you realize that when we multiply with base of 10 and 100 the left portion contains 1 digit and 2 digits respectively. Next, when we multiply with base of 1000 then left side will contain 3 digits. So, fact is that how many zeros('0') a base have, that many digits left side will contain.

Even if you don't understand the above steps. Don't worry! Then, Start from here.

Attempt the following and post their answers in comments:

- 93x98 = ?
- 27 x 99 = ?
- 81x91 = ?
- 25x78 = ?
- 56 x98 = ?

**Vedic Multiplication Methods**comes to end. In the next lesson we will learn how to multiply with base of 1000.

I am preparing for my Canara Bank Exam. I need some more tricks. To hang out with.

ReplyDelete@Deepak Surely, I will provide more stuff. Keep visiting!

ReplyDeleteThese tricks are really helpful

ReplyDeleteFYI The problem 67 x 97 above contains and error. 66 x 97 = 6402 vice 6502. Great blog. Thanks

ReplyDelete@Andrew Thanks lot for Improving me.

ReplyDeleteplease give me more maths tricks

ReplyDelete