### Vedic Mathematics Tricks - Multiply by 11 - Part One

Friends, this technique will teaches you how to multiply any number by eleven, easily and quickly. Here, I demonstrated some examples to use this technique. From these examples you will see the pattern used and how easy they are to do.

**Example 1. Multiply 45 by 11** **Step 1.** Split **45** apart, like so: **4__5**

4__5

**Step 2.** Add these two digits together **4+5=9**

4+5=9

**Final Step.** Place the answer, **9** in between **4__5** it gives **495.** Which is the correct answer.

495

Was that so simple and quicker than traditional method. Let's try another example:

**Example 2. Multiply 68 by 11** **Step 1.** Again Split **68,** like so, **6__8**

6__8

**Step 2.** Adding these two we get, **6+8=14**

6+8=14

**Final Step.** So, we have to put **14** in between **6__8 oh, Don't do this 6148** this is **wrong.**

**Do this : Place 4 from 14 in between 6__8 it will give 648 add 1 as carry to left that 6. Now we get, 748**

1

__648__

748

Here are some problems for your practice, post the answers in your comments.

- 83x11=?
- 65x11=?
- 35x11=?
- 91x11=?
- 69x11=?

Continue to second part of this post how to multiply 11 by more than two digits

If you want to share your knowledge, comment, your experience or even a small problem. Feel free to express via comments. Soon, I'll back with new quick technique.

All the contents you mentioned in post is too good and can be very useful. I will keep it in mind, thanks for sharing the information keep updating, looking forward for more posts.

ReplyDelete--------------------

vedic math tricks

Very informative article which is about the mental math and i must bookmark it, keep posting interesting articles.

ReplyDeletemental math